EP3772395 - WORK STATION WITH ROLLER SECTION AND LOADING AND UNLOADING CARRIAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mehltretter, J. Michael Kagerbauerstraße 52 82049 Pullach / DE | [2021/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/06] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [2021/06] | Application number, filing date | 19190318.6 | 06.08.2019 | [2021/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772395 | Date: | 10.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/16, B65G65/00, B23P21/00 | [2021/06] | CPC: |
B25H1/16 (EP);
B65G65/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSPLATZ MIT ROLLENSTRECKE SOWIE BE- UND ENTLADEWAGEN | [2021/06] | English: | WORK STATION WITH ROLLER SECTION AND LOADING AND UNLOADING CARRIAGE | [2021/06] | French: | POSTE DE TRAVAIL POURVU DE VOIE À ROULEAUX AINSI QUE CHARIOT DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DÉCHARGEMENT | [2021/06] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19525792 (TOSHIBA EUROP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 4 *; | [X]CN105291067 (ANHUI HELI CO LTD) [X] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]CN106379617 (JIANGYIN UNI-POL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,3 *; | [I]FR3062321 (SOLYSTIC [FR]) [I] 13,14* page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]CN109605302 (TCL KING ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES HUIZHOU CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202004014957U | EP3441194 |