EP3584387 - OSB PLATE AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUTER, Harald Zellerhornstr.83 72461 Albstadt / DE | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19190530.6 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584387 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584387 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/10, E04F13/08 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
E04F13/0896 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (RU);
B32B21/02 (US);
B32B21/06 (US);
B32B3/06 (US);
E04C2/12 (US);
E04C2/24 (RU);
E04F13/0866 (US);
E04F13/0894 (EP,US);
E04F13/10 (EP,US);
B32B2419/06 (US);
B32B2471/00 (US);
B32B2607/00 (US);
E04F13/0864 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0107 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OSB-PLATTE UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBIGEN | [2019/52] | English: | OSB PLATE AND USE OF THE SAME | [2019/52] | French: | PANNEAU OSB ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 15.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17196384.6 / EP3470599 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | IE | 13.10.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MK | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2328051 (BULL ALVAH S); | [Y]WO2004053257 (PERGO EUROP AB [SE]); | [Y]US2010236171 (LIU DAVID C [US]); | [Y]WO2016113721 (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU]); | [Y]EP3075923 (SWISS KRONO TEC AG [CH]); | [YD]WO2017013221 (AKZENTA PANEELE + PROFILE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202014105181U | WO2017013221 |