EP3608781 - PLATFORM PRODUCT RECOMMENDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/08] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Servicenow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODMAN, Mark David c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
VITTENGL, Julie c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
BERGER, Lionel Christian c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19190699.9 | 08.08.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US201816058121 | 08.08.2018 Original published format: US201816058121 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608781 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP);
H04L67/535 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/60 (US);
G06F16/245 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTFORMPRODUKTEMPFEHLER | [2020/07] | English: | PLATFORM PRODUCT RECOMMENDER | [2020/07] | French: | PLATEFORME DE RECOMMANDATION DE PRODUITS | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010325122 (YASSIN OHAD [IL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0078] *; | [I]US2015193246 (LUFT SIEGFRIED [CA]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0125] *; | [A]WO2016149080 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2017371650 (LI HUI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088] * |