EP3608846 - IMPROVED MACHINE LEARNING CLASSIFICATION WITH MODEL QUALITY PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Servicenow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYARAMAN, Baskar c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19190868.0 | 08.08.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US201816059700 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: US201816059700 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608846 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06F18/211 (US);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06F18/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON MASCHINELLEM LERNEN MIT VORHERSAGE DER MODELLQUALITÄT | [2020/07] | English: | IMPROVED MACHINE LEARNING CLASSIFICATION WITH MODEL QUALITY PREDICTION | [2020/07] | French: | CLASSIFICATION D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE AMÉLIORÉE AVEC PRÉDICTION DE QUALITÉ DE MODÈLE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 11.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 12.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - CHU CARLTON ET AL, "Does feature selection improve classification accuracy? Impact of sample size and feature selection on classification using anatomical magnetic resonance images", NEUROIMAGE, (20120301), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROIMAGE.2011.11.066, ISSN 1053-8119, pages 59 - 70, XP028897369 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * § 1, lines 76-78 * * § 1, lines 86-87 * * § 2.1 * * § 2.2, lines 1-3 * * § 2.3 * * § 2.5, lines 1-2 * * § 2.5, lines 16-37 * * § 3, lines 47-48 * * § 3, lines 6-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2011.11.066 | [I] - G.M. FOODY ET AL, "The effect of training set size and composition on artificial neural network classification", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REMOTE SENSING, GB, (19950601), vol. 16, no. 9, doi:10.1080/01431169508954507, ISSN 0143-1161, pages 1707 - 1723, XP055652703 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * § 1, lines 38-41 * * § 2, lines 19-37 * * § 3, lines 1-3 * * § 3, lines 9-10 * * § 3.1 * * § 3.2 * * § 5, lines 20-23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01431169508954507 |