EP3777550 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING A SUGAR-CONTAINING SUBSTANCE FROM A COCOA FRUIT AND USE OF THE SUGAR-CONTAINING SUBSTANCE IN THE PRODUCTION OF CHOCOLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Ritter GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Ritter-Strasse 25 71111 Waldenbuch / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPPE, Tim Brucknerstrasse 25 72766 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
BACHMEIR, Johann Platanenweg 68 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
ARETZ, Jan Leibnizstr. 6/1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19191953.9 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777550 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/02, A23G1/00, C13B10/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A23G1/002 (EP);
A23G1/02 (EP);
A23G1/36 (EP);
A23G1/40 (EP);
C12P19/02 (EP);
C12P19/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG EINER ZUCKERHALTIGEN SUBSTANZ AUS EINER KAKAOFRUCHT UND VERWENDUNG DER ZUCKERHALTIGEN SUBSTANZ BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON SCHOKOLADE | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING A SUGAR-CONTAINING SUBSTANCE FROM A COCOA FRUIT AND USE OF THE SUGAR-CONTAINING SUBSTANCE IN THE PRODUCTION OF CHOCOLATE | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE CONTENANT DU SUCRE À PARTIR D'UNE CABOSSE ET UTILISATION DE LA SUBSTANCE CONTENANT DU SUCRE DANS LA FABRICATION DE CHOCOLAT | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 04.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2230444 (DREVICI KUX URSULA DR) [A] 1-16 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; claim 1 *; | [A]CH622028 (MUELLER HANS DR ING FA) [A] 1,5,14-16 * abstract *; | [A]FR2828379 (LASME MEL FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 17 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 20 *; | [XY]WO2017044610 (TOTH JERRY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * [Y] 5,7; | [XY]EP3498102 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 14-16 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; claims 1-7,9,10,14,18,19,22,23 * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0202] * [Y] 5,7; | [A] - ANVOH ET AL, "Production and characterization of juice from mucilage of cocoa beans and its transformation into marmalade.", PAKISTAN JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (20091231), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.3923/pjn.2009.129.133, pages 129 - 133, XP055368951 [A] 1 * abstract * * Materials and Methods; page 130 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3923/pjn.2009.129.133 | other | EP0033549 | BR102013005053 | - Bolenz Siegfried, Amtsberg Kristina, Schape Rita, "The broader usage of sugars and fillers in milk chocolate made possible by the new EC cocoa directive", International Journal of Food Science and Technology, GB , (20060101), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2005.01023.x, ISSN 0950-5423, pages 45 - 55, XP055884422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2005.01023.x | - URL: https://www.clubdelchocolate.com/1552-nicaragua-70-pulpa-de-cacao-chocolate-negro.html | - Georg Bernandini, Der Schokoladentester, (20120101), pages 70, 71, 508 - 509, XP055884425 |