EP3779201 - SCRAPER ELEMENT FOR THE LEADING EDGES OF IMPELLERS OF WASTE WATER PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäger, Christoph KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Kaminski, Mateusz KSB S.A.S. 128 rue Carnot 59320 Lille Sequedin / FR | 03 /
Müller, Enrico KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Petit, Nicolas KSB S.A.S., 128 rue Carnot 59320 Lille Sequedin / FR | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
Jäger, Christoph KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02 /
Kaminski, Mateusz KSB S.A.S. 128 rue Carnot 59320 Lille Sequedin / FR | |||
03 /
Müller, Enrico KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
04 /
Petit, Nicolas KSB S.A.S., 128 rue Carnot 59320 Lille Sequedin / FR | Application number, filing date | 19191970.3 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779201 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779201 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/04, F04D29/22, F04D29/70 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F04D7/045 (EP,CN);
F04D29/2288 (EP,CN,US);
F04D29/708 (EP,CN,US);
F04D7/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSTREIFELEMENT FÜR LAUFRADEINTRITTSKANTEN VON ABWASSERPUMPEN | [2021/07] | English: | SCRAPER ELEMENT FOR THE LEADING EDGES OF IMPELLERS OF WASTE WATER PUMPS | [2021/07] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RACLAGE POUR BORDS D'ATTAQUE DE ROUE À AUBES POUR DES POMPES À EAU | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 14.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 15.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 07.09.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4604035 (ROBERTS JAMES R [US]); | [A]US6190121 (HAYWARD JOHN [CA], et al); | [XA]US2009123270 (ANDERSSON PATRIK [SE]) | Examination | US3096718 |