EP3639811 - NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING PARTICLES COMPRISING A COMPLEX OF A DOUBLE-STRANDED POLYRIBONUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYALKYLENEIMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Highlight Therapeutics, S.L. Parque Cientifico de la Universidad de Valencia C/ Catedrático Agustin Escardino 9, Paterna 46980 Valencia / ES | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Bioncotech Therapeutics, S.L Parque Científico de la Universidad de Valencia C/ Catedrático Agustín Escardino 9, Paterna 46980 Valencia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POZUELO RUBIO, Mercedes 46980 Paterna Valencia / ES | 02 /
QUINTERO ORTIZ, Marisol 46980 Paterna Valencia / ES | 03 /
VILLANUEVA GARCÍA, Ana Plaza Xuquer 8-8 46021 Valencia / ES | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/17] | 01 /
POZUELO RUBIO, Mercedes Bioncotech Therapeutics, S.L Parque Científico de la Universidad de Valencia C/ Catedrático Agustín Escardino 9 46980 Paterna Valencia / ES | ||
02 /
QUINTERO ORTIZ, Marisol Bioncotech Therapeutics, S.L Parque Científico de la Universidad de Valencia C/ Catedrático Agustín Escardino 9 46980 Paterna Valencia / ES | |||
03 /
VILLANUEVA GARCÍA, Ana Plaza Xuquer 8-8 46021 Valencia / ES | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/17] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19192230.1 | 17.11.2016 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | EP20150194864 | 17.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15194864 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639811 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639811 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K9/19, A61K47/26, A61K31/713, A61K47/69, A61P35/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61K47/6935 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,CN,ES,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,CH,CN,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/69 (ES);
A61K31/15 (US);
A61K31/7105 (CN,GB);
A61K31/7115 (CN,ES);
A61K31/74 (US);
A61K47/26 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (US);
A61P15/02 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,ES,KR);
C07K16/2818 (US);
C07K16/2827 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UMFASSEND PARTIKEL UMFASSEND EINEN KOMPLEX EINES DOPPELSTRÄNGIGEN POLYRIBONUCLEOTIDS UND EINES POLYALKYLENIMINS | [2020/17] | English: | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING PARTICLES COMPRISING A COMPLEX OF A DOUBLE-STRANDED POLYRIBONUCLEOTIDE AND A POLYALKYLENEIMINE | [2020/17] | French: | NOUVELLE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE D'UN POLYRIBONUCLÉOTIDE DOUBLE BRIN ET UNE POLYALKYLÈNEIMINE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 19.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16805990.5 / EP3319587 | Divisional application(s) | EP22214732.4 / EP4183386 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2011003883 (FUNDACION CT NAC INVESTIGACIONES ONCOLOGICAS CARLOS III [ES], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2013087083 (BIONTECH AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 16, paragraph 5 - page 17, paragraph 4 * * page 21, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 1 *; | [ADP]WO2015173824 (ALEX LEVITZKI MAN AND HOLDINGS LTD [IL]) [ADP] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I] - DAVID SCHAFFERT ET AL, "Poly(I:C)-Mediated Tumor Growth Suppression in EGF-Receptor Overexpressing Tumors Using EGF-Polyethylene Glycol-Linear Polyethylenimine as Carrier", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, US, (20110401), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s11095-010-0225-4, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 731 - 741, XP055236351 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 732, column r, paragraph l - page 733, column r, paragraph 4 * * page 734, column l, paragraph l - page 734, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 735; table 1 * * page 737, column r, paragraph 3 - page 739, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 740, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-010-0225-4 | [A] - KUROSAKI T ET AL, "Ternary complexes of pDNA, polyethylenimine, and gamma-polyglutamic acid for gene delivery systems", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 30, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2009.01.055, ISSN 0142-9612, (20090501), pages 2846 - 2853, (20090220), XP025970952 [A] 1-15 * page 2846, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2847, column l, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 2847; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2009.01.055 | by applicant | WO2004045491 | WO2005102278 | WO2008057696 | US2009117306 | US2011003883 | WO2011003883 | WO2013040552 | CN102988303 | WO2013063019 | WO2013087083 | WO2013164380 | CN103599071 | WO2014057432 | WO2014165296 | WO2015067632 | WO2015173824 | - LEVITZKI A, Front. Oncol., (20120000), vol. 2, page 4 | - AMMI R et al., Pharmacol. Ther., (20150000), vol. 146, pages 1 20 - 31 | - AMOS SM et al., Cancer Immunol. Immunother, (20110000), vol. 60, pages 671 - 83 | - BALD T et al., Cancer Discov., (20140000), vol. 4, pages 674 - 87 | - BHOOPATHI P et al., Cancer Res., (20140000), vol. 74, pages 6224 - 35 | - BILENSOY E, Expert Opin. Drug Deliv., (20100000), vol. 7, pages 795 - 809 | - CHEN L et al., Int. J. Nanomed., (20130000), vol. 8, pages 137 - 145 | - CHIBA Y et al., PLoSOne, (20130000), vol. 8, page e76159 | - CHO K. et al., Immunobioloav, (20160000), vol. 30359-X, no. 16, pages S0171 - 2985 | - COBALEDA-SILES M et al., Small., (20140000), vol. 10, pages 5054 - 67 | - DUEWELL P et al., Oncolmmunol., (20150000), vol. 4, no. 10, page e1029698 | - EWEL C et al., Cancer Res., (19920000), vol. 52, pages 3005 - 10 | - FUJIMURA T et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (20060000), vol. 36, pages 3371 - 80 | - GALLUZZI L et al., Oncotarget, (20140000), vol. 5, pages 12472 - 508 | - GARCIA-PASCUAL CGOMEZ R, J. Endometr., (20130000), vol. 5, no. 1, page 13 | - GERMERSHAUS ONULTSCH K, Asi J Pharm Sci., (20150000), vol. 10, pages 159 - 175 | - GUPTA S et al., Tumor Biol., (20160000), vol. 37, pages 12089 - 12102 | - HAFNER A et al., Advanced Drug Delivery Rev., (20130000), vol. 65, no. 10, pages 1386 - 1399 | - VAN DER JEUGHT K et al., Oncotarget, (20150000), vol. 6, pages 27252 - 27266 | - ISLAM M et al., Journal of Controlled Release, (20140000), vol. 193, pages 74 - 89 | - KABILOVA T et al., BMC Cancer, (20140000), vol. 14, page 338 | - KEIR M et al., Annu. Rev. Immunol., (20080000), vol. 26, pages 677 - 704 | - KUB)ER K et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (20110000), vol. 41, pages 3028 - 39 | - KUROSAKI T et al., Biomaterials, (20090000), vol. 30, pages 2846 - 2853 | - LE U et al., Canc. Biol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 7, pages 440 - 447 | - LE U et al., Radiother. Oncol., (20090000), vol. 90, pages 273 - 279 | - MATIJEVIC T et al., Chemotherapy, (20110000), vol. 57, pages 460 - 7 | - MCBAIN S et al., J. Mater. Chem., (20070000), vol. 17, pages 2561 - 2565 | - NAGATO TCELIS E, Oncoimmunology, (20140000), vol. 3, page e28440 | - OHASHI T et al., Int. J. Cancer, (20130000), vol. 133, pages 1107 - 18 | - PALCHETTI S et al., RSC Adv., (20130000), vol. 3, pages 24597 - 24604 | - PERROT I et al., J. Immunol., (20100000), vol. 185, pages 2080 - 2088 | - SAJADIAN A et al., Arch. Virol., (20140000), vol. 159, pages 1951 - 1960 | - SAHEKI A et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20110000), vol. 406, pages 117 - 21 | - SANCHEZ-PAULETE AR et al., Cancer Discov., (20150000), pages CD-15 - 0510 | - SCHAFFERT D et al., Pharm. Res., (20110000), vol. 28, pages 731 - 741 | - SHABANI M et al., Avicenna J. Med. Biotech., (20100000), vol. 2, pages 123 - 130 | - STORZ U, MAbs, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 310 - 7 | - SZABO A et al., Melanoma Res., (20120000), vol. 22, pages 351 - 361 | - TAURA M et al., Cancer Sci., (20100000), vol. 101, pages 1610 - 7 | - TORMO D et al., Cancer Cell, (20090000), vol. 16, pages 103 - 114 | - TUTIN-MOEAVIN I et al., Org & Biomol Chem., (20150000), vol. 13, pages 9005 - 9011 | - VACCHELLI E et al., Oncoimmunology, (20130000), vol. 2, page e25396,e23510,e25595 | - VEGA-LETTER A et al., Stem Cell Res. & Ther., (20160000), vol. 7, page 150 | - YOSHINO HKASHIWAKURA I, Blood, (20130000), vol. 122, page 4721 | - YU L et al., Immunol Cell Biol., (20160000), vol. 94, pages 875 - 885 | - ZHANG Y et al., Cancer Lett., (20140000), vol. 355, pages 76 - 84 | - ZHOU Y et al., Innate Immun., (20130000), vol. 19, pages 184 - 192 |