EP3617967 - TAXI SYSTEM WITH IMAGE BASED DETERMINATION OF SPECIAL TRANSPORTATION NEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill 14004 St. Michael / BB | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mangal, Nandita 590 Deodora Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
Laur, Michael H. 21991 Grass Valley Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 19192546.0 | 20.08.2019 | [2020/10] | Priority number, date | US201862720264P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720264 P | US201816109973 | 23.08.2018 Original published format: US201816109973 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617967 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063112 (EP);
G06Q10/0631 (CN);
G06Q50/40 (CN,US);
G06V20/00 (CN);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06V40/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2020/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAXISYSTEM MIT BILDGESTÜTZTER BESTIMMUNG VON SPEZIELLEN TRANSPORTBEDÜRFNISSEN | [2020/10] | English: | TAXI SYSTEM WITH IMAGE BASED DETERMINATION OF SPECIAL TRANSPORTATION NEEDS | [2020/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TAXI COMPORTANT UNE DÉTERMINATION À BASE D'IMAGE DE BESOINS SPÉCIAUX DE TRANSPORT | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2007154509 (NTT FACILITIES INC, et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0033] - [0042]; figures 5,6,7 *; | [I]CN101399731 (ZHIHAO ZHENG [CN]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0028] - [0047] - [0055]; figures 3,5 *; | [I]US2017193826 (MARUELI SUNNY [IL], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] - [0 25] , [0029] , [0050] - [0052] - [0058] - [0060]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2018157268 (MANGAL NANDITA [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016]; figure 1 *; | [I]GB2559032 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024] , [0036]; figures 1a,1b *; | [T] - DAISUKE HOSOTANI ET AL, "Wheelchair recognition by using stereo vision and histogram of oriented gradients (HOG) in real environments", APPLICATIONS OF COMPUTER VISION (WACV), 2009 WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091207), ISBN 978-1-4244-5497-6, pages 1 - 6, XP031622277 [T] * abstract * |