EP3783370 - ROGOWSKI CURRENT TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEM International SA Chemin des Aulx 8 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSTADINOVA, Aneliya Ninova 74 Hemus 1111 Sofia / BG | 02 /
IVANOV, Pavel Olegov 40 Housing Complex Lagera 1612 Sofia / BG | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19192727.6 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783370 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/18 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
G01R15/181 (EP,KR,US);
G01R19/0092 (US);
H01B9/028 (KR);
H01F27/2823 (KR);
H01F27/288 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROGOWSKI-STROMWANDLER | [2021/08] | English: | ROGOWSKI CURRENT TRANSDUCER | [2021/08] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR DE COURANT ROGOWSKI | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0851442 (ABB TRANSMIT OY [FI]); | [A]FR2803914 (SAGEM [FR]); | [A]EP1302773 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]); | [A]US2006232265 (FRITSCH CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2008211484 (HOWELL DONALD W [US], et al); | [YD]EP2009453 (LEM LIAISONS ELECTRON MEC [CH]); | [A]EP2887076 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]); | [A]US2016077133 (LEE JAE CHAN [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2017220827 (SMILICS TECH S L [ES]); | [A]EP3276363 (GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH [CH]); | [A]WO2018108828 (EATON IND NETHERLANDS BV [NL]); | [A]CN207743438U (YUEQING LANDONG ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD); | by applicant | EP2009453 |