02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
15.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
03.11.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
25.11.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
22.11.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.11.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.11.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.10.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.08.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
03.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
08.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
22.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
23.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|