Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11171343 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2021 | B2 | US2020091537 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018215892 | 19.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110931828 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018215892 | 19.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3627602 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | B1 | EP3627602 | 25.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018215892 | 19.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018215892 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018215892 | 19.09.2018 |