EP3639963 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A RESISTANCE WELDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haeufgloeckner, Juergen Roscheklinge 32 63936 Schneeberg / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19193526.1 | 26.08.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | DE201810217670 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018217670 | [2020/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3639963 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3639963 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639963 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/11, B23K11/25, G05B13/00, // B23K101/00, B23K101/18 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B23K11/115 (EP);
B23K11/24 (CN);
B23K11/257 (EP,US);
B23K11/11 (US);
B23K11/36 (CN);
B23K2101/006 (EP);
B23K2101/18 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | B23K11/11, B23K11/25, // B23K101/00, B23K101/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER WIDERSTANDSCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A RESISTANCE WELDING DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE PAR RÉSISTANCE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 06.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4737828U ; | [A]DE9317013U (KUKA SCHWEISSANLAGEN & ROBOTER [DE]); | [A]US5552575 (DOUMANIDIS CHARALABOS C [US]); | [A]DE69207735T (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]WO2006042572 (KARAKAS ERDOGAN [DE]); | [A]EP2246760 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]JP2012095442 (DAIHEN CORP) | by applicant | DE10334478 | DE102006038768 | DE102013218138 | DE102015225050 |