EP3617750 - THERANOSTIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kromek Group, Plc Netpark, Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, County Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGG, James William Kromek Group plc NETPark Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, Durham TS21 3FD / GB | 02 /
RADLEY, Ian Kromek Group plc NETPark Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/10] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19193746.5 | 27.08.2019 | [2020/10] | Priority number, date | US201816116430 | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US201816116430 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617750 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3617750 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/164, G01T1/24 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G01T1/1648 (EP);
G01T1/2023 (IL,US);
A61B6/4258 (CN);
G01T1/2018 (IL);
G01T1/249 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2020/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | THERANOSTISCHE BILDGEBUNG | [2020/10] | English: | THERANOSTIC IMAGING | [2020/10] | French: | IMAGERIE THÉRANOSTIQUE | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 27.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2023 | 08.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0239142 (MARCONI MEDICAL SYS INC [US]); | [Y]US2017016998 (SHAHAR ARIE [IL], et al); | [XY]US2018018768 (HSU BAILING [TW]); |