EP3626988 - VEHICLE CLUTCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raicam Driveline S.R.L. Corso Genova, 40 12084 Mondovi (CN) / IT | [2021/13] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Raicam Clutch Limited The Pinnacle 160 Midsummer Boulevard Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1FF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Struve, Benjamin Chetwood 15 Lower Ladyes Hills Kenilworth, Warwickshire CV8 2GN / GB | 02 /
Child, David Stephen 9 Underhill Way Bishops Tachbrook Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV33 9ST / GB | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger RM Patent Services Twin Oaks, 88 Howes Lane Finham Coventry, CV3 6PJ / GB | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19193951.1 | 27.08.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | GB20180015174 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: GB 201815174 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626988 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/71, F16D13/48 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
F16D13/71 (EP);
F16D13/48 (EP);
F16D2013/706 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKUPPLUNG | [2020/13] | English: | VEHICLE CLUTCHES | [2020/13] | French: | EMBRAYAGES DE VÉHICULE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 25.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5431268 (MIZUKAMI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 61 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5651437 (ORGANEK GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - column 8, line 54; figures 1-6 *; | [XA]US5706924 (BACHER MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 10 - column 10, line 26; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-8,10-16 |