EP3623518 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A CLEANING MATERIAL DURING A CLEANING PROCESS IN A CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/12] | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A CLEANING MATERIAL DURING A CLEANING PROCESS IN A CLEANING DEVICE AND CLEANING DEVICE | ||
[2022/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bicker, Rainer Miele & Cie. KG Posener Str. 34 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
Drücker, Markus Miele & Cie. KG Heinrich-Heine-Weg 14 33335 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
Kortenjann, Magnus Miele & Cie. KG Vosshaar 29 48291 Telgte / DE | 04 /
Templin, Ralf Miele & Cie. KG Essener Str. 13 33647 Bielefeld / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19194009.7 | 28.08.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | DE201810122461 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018122461 | [2020/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623518 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623518 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/46, A61L2/07, D06F33/72, A47L15/00, // D06F105/30, D06F58/38, D06F105/28, D06F103/02, D06F103/12, D06F105/02, D06F25/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
A61L2/07 (EP);
D06F33/46 (EP);
D06F33/72 (EP);
A47L15/0047 (EP);
A47L2401/04 (EP);
A47L2501/06 (EP);
A61L2202/17 (EP);
A61L2202/26 (EP);
D06F2103/02 (EP);
D06F2103/12 (EP);
D06F2105/02 (EP);
D06F2105/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | D06F35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES ERWÄRMENS EINES REINIGUNGSGUTS WÄHREND EINES REINIGUNGSVORGANGS IN EINEM REINIGUNGSGERÄT | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A CLEANING MATERIAL DURING A CLEANING PROCESS IN A CLEANING DEVICE | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE CHAUFFAGE D'UN PRODUIT À NETTOYER AU COURS D'UN PROCESSUS DE NETTOYAGE DANS UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE | [2022/31] |
Former [2020/12] | VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES ERWÄRMENS EINES REINIGUNGSGUTS WÄHREND EINES REINIGUNGSVORGANGS IN EINEM REINIGUNGSGERÄT UND REINIGUNGSGERÄT | ||
Former [2020/12] | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A CLEANING MATERIAL DURING A CLEANING PROCESS IN A CLEANING DEVICE AND CLEANING DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/12] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE CHAUFFAGE D'UN PRODUIT À NETTOYER AU COURS D'UN PROCESSUS DE NETTOYAGE DANS UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE | Examination procedure | 08.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009255299 (HIRO NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * figures 12-13 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0193] * [I] 5; | [X]US2012180534 (CHO IN HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figure 8 * * paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0193] *; | [X]EP2503048 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] *; | [XI]DE102013210129 (BSH BOSCH & SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0037] * [I] 6; | [A]DE102017103498 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0024] *; | [XP]EP3375344 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [XP] 1,2,5,7-9 * figure 1 * * claims 1, 12-13 ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * |