EP3786412 - ROLLER SHUTTER AND FOLDING SHUTTER MADE OF COMPOSITE BAMBOO MATERIAL AND USE OF COMPOSITE BAMBOO MATERIAL FOR MANUFACTURING THE ROLLER SHUTTER AND FOLDING SHUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regazzi Holding SA Via alle Gerre 1 6596 Gordola / CH | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez, Raffael Via Piave 21 21023 Besozzo / IT | 02 /
Kollmann, Ulrich Via alla Chiesa 19 6516 Cugnasco / CH | 03 /
Minero, Luca Via B. Foletti 3 6900 Massagno / CH | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Gottschalk, Matthias Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Florastrasse 14 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Gottschalk, Matthias Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Splügenstrasse 8 8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19194056.8 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786412 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/04, B32B21/14, E06B9/11, E06B9/15 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
E06B9/04 (EP);
E06B9/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLLADEN UND KLAPPLADEN AUS BAMBUS-VERBUNDMATERIAL UND VERWENDUNG EINES BAMBUS-VERBUNDMATERIALS ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES ROLLLADENS UND DES KLAPPLADENS | [2021/09] | English: | ROLLER SHUTTER AND FOLDING SHUTTER MADE OF COMPOSITE BAMBOO MATERIAL AND USE OF COMPOSITE BAMBOO MATERIAL FOR MANUFACTURING THE ROLLER SHUTTER AND FOLDING SHUTTER | [2021/09] | French: | VOLET ROULANT ET VOLET BATTANT EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DE BAMBOU ET UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DE BAMBOU POUR FABRIQUER LE VOLET ROULANT ET LE VOLET BATTANT | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6746745 (NIEN MING [TW]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]CN2644649Y (WUHAN CHUTIAN GREEN LASER PROC [CN]) [X] 1 * page 3; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]WO2005103432 (FU YUSHUANG [CN]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * [A] 1; | [XI]CN201661223U (WEICHENG CHEN) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] - [0018]; figure 1 * [I] 2,8,9; | [XY]CN202144714U (ZHEJIANG ANJI SHUANGHU BAMBOO WOODEN CO LTD) [X] 4,7 * paragraph [0019] * [Y] 5,6 |