EP3606012 - COERCED ENCRYPTION ON CONNECTED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dropbox, Inc. 185 Berry Street, Suite 400 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYRNE, Sean 185 Berry Street Suite 400 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 19194287.9 | 30.06.2014 | [2020/06] | Priority number, date | US201313957003 | 01.08.2013 Original published format: US201313957003 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606012 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606012 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F21/78, G06F21/88 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L63/0281 (US);
G06F12/1408 (US);
G06F21/60 (US);
G06F21/78 (EP,US);
G06F21/88 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (US);
H04L63/0457 (US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
G06F2212/1052 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERZWUNGENE VERSCHLÜSSELUNG BEI VERBUNDENEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/06] | English: | COERCED ENCRYPTION ON CONNECTED DEVICES | [2020/06] | French: | CRYPTAGE FORCÉ SUR DISPOSITIFS CONNECTÉS | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 04.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14744691.8 / EP3014856 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2014 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | ES | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | NL | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | LU | 30.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
LU | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009177895 (MURAYAMA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 30] , [0 57] * * paragraphs [0165] - [0170]; figure 18 ** paragraphs [0171] - [0176]; figure 19 *; | [I]US2009232300 (ZUCKER ELAD [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 16] , [0 17] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figure 2 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2011004941 (MENDEZ DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 8A, 8B * |