EP3620545 - BRAKE DISC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC 330 Town Center Drive, Suite 800 South Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rettig, Marc Piusstraße 26 50823 Köln / DE | 02 /
Grochowicz, Jaroslaw Neukölnstr. 11 45357 Essen / DE | 03 /
Grabiec, Tomasz Pawel Heitberg 2 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
Verpoort, Clemens Maria Fasanenweg 12 40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
Wank, Andreas GTV Verschleißschutz GmbH Vor der Neuwiese 7 57629 Luckenbach / DE | 06 /
Hitzek, Alexander GTV Verschleißschutz GmbH Vor der Neuwiese 7 57629 Luckenbach / DE | 07 /
Schmengler, Christian GTV Verschleißschutz GmbH Vor der Neuwiese 7 57629 Luckenbach / DE | 08 /
Müller-Roden, Karin GTV Verschleißschutz GmbH Vor der Neuwiese 7 57629 Luckenbach / DE | 09 /
Käsgen, Klaus Kradenpuhl 29 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Markowitz, Markus Ford-Werke GmbH Patentabteilung NH/4L Henry-Ford-Straße 1 50735 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Markowitz, Markus Ford-Werke GmbH Abt. NH/364 Henry-Ford-Straße 1 50735 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 19194298.6 | 29.08.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | DE201810215042 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018215042 | DE201910210088 | 09.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210088 | [2020/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3620545 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3620545 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620545 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02, C23C4/06, C23C4/10, C23C4/129, C23C28/02, C23C28/00, F16D65/00, F16D65/12, F16D65/02, C23C10/28 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
F16D65/127 (EP);
C23C10/28 (EP);
C23C28/023 (EP);
C23C28/025 (EP);
C23C28/027 (EP);
C23C28/322 (EP);
C23C28/3225 (EP);
C23C28/341 (EP);
C23C28/347 (EP);
C23C4/02 (EP);
C23C4/06 (EP);
C23C4/10 (EP);
C23C4/129 (EP);
F16D65/0025 (EP);
F16D2065/132 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | C23C4/02, C23C4/06, C23C4/10, C23C4/129, C23C28/02, C23C28/00, F16D65/00, F16D65/12, F16D65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BREMSSCHEIBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER BREMSSCHEIBE | [2020/11] | English: | BRAKE DISC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/11] | French: | DISQUE DE FREIN ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISQUE DE FREIN | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2019 | AL | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | IT | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | MT | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | IE | 29.08.2021 | LU | 29.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.08.2019 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.08.2019 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 09.06.2021 | |
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009008105 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* page 3, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 38 *; | [I]DE102014205666 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1-13 * page 2, paragraphs 6-8 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 4, paragraphs 21,22 * * page 5, paragraphs 27-31,33,34 * * page 6, paragraphs 43-51 * * figures 3,4 *; | [I]DE102015204813 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1-13 * page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 4, paragraph 28 - page 6, paragraph 39 * * page 7, paragraphs 51-57 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE102014015474 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 28 - page 5, paragraph 35 * | by applicant | JP2005239115 | JP2009168162 | US8006740 | DE102010052735 | DE102012022775 | DE102010048075 | DE102014006064 | DE102014004616 | DE102015122325 | DE202018102704U |