EP3786590 - SENSOR ELEMENT AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING PROCESS PARAMETERS IN A SINTERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanisch, Michael Burghardtstr. 5 16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE | 02 /
Jeske, Nora Elberfelderstr. 15 10555 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Sommerfeld, Dennis Friedrichsbrunner Straße 26 12347 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Wittreich, Ulrich Jacob-Plohn-Str. 10 16727 Velten / DE | 05 /
Massierer, Jonas Lüdersdorfer Str. 16 16269 Schulzendorf / DE | 06 /
Matiwe, Marco Oettingerstraße 8 12555 Berlin / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19194365.3 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786590 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/00, G01D21/02, G01L1/00, G01K1/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G01D21/02 (EP,US);
G01D21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORELEMENT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON PROZESSPARAMETERN IN EINER SINTERANLAGE | [2021/09] | English: | SENSOR ELEMENT AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING PROCESS PARAMETERS IN A SINTERING SYSTEM | [2021/09] | French: | ÉLÉMENT CAPTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE PARAMÈTRES DE PROCESSUS DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE FRITTAGE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2914636B (ISHIZAKI KOZO; KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-14 * Abbildung 1 und die entsprechenden Abschnitte der Beschreibung *; | [A]US2007119226 (TELLENBACH JEAN-MAURICE [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064]; figure 2 *; | [A]JP5941686B (SS ALLOY KK) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 16]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]CN106908473 (UNIV ANHUI TECHNOLOGY) [A] 5 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051]; figure 4 * |