EP3620550 - METHODS FOR MAKING SILICON CONTAINING FILMS THAT HAVE HIGH CARBON CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versum Materials US, LLC 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lei, Xinjian 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | 02 /
HARIPIN, Chandra 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | 03 /
KIM, Moo-Sung 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19194473.5 | 29.08.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201862724109P | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862724109 P | US201916553080 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: US201916553080 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620550 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620550 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, C23C16/455, C23C16/56, C23C16/32 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C23C16/401 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/402 (CN);
C01B33/12 (US);
C23C16/0209 (US);
C23C16/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45525 (CN);
C23C16/45536 (US);
C23C16/45542 (EP,KR);
C23C16/45553 (EP,KR);
C23C16/56 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02167 (KR);
H01L21/02208 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SILICIUMHALTIGEN SCHICHTEN MIT HOHEM KOHLENSTOFFGEHALT | [2020/11] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING SILICON CONTAINING FILMS THAT HAVE HIGH CARBON CONTENT | [2020/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE FILMS CONTENANT DU SILICIUM ET À FORTE TENEUR EN CARBONE | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 22.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015147484 (NGUYEN VICTOR [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2015255274 (YAMAMOTO RYUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] ** paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] *; | [X]US2018023192 (CHANDRA HARIPIN [US], et al) [X] 5,7-10 * paragraph [0091] * * claim 9 * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0094] * * table 1 * * paragraph [0095]; claim 9 * * claim 10 * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0143] *; | [X]US2018033614 (CHANDRA HARIPIN [US], et al) [X] 5-8 * paragraph [0051]; claims 6,18 * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * | by applicant | US5069244 | US5465766 | US6077356 | US7334595 | WO2012039833 | US2013022496 | US8575033 | US8722546 | WO2014134476 | US2014287596 | US2015044881 | US9234276 | US9343290 | US9349586 | US9455138 | - LIU et al., Jpn. J. Appl. Phys., (19990000), vol. 38, pages 3482 - 3486 | - KIM et al., Journal of the Korean Physical Society, (20020000), vol. 40, page 94 | - POSSEME et al., Solid State Phenomena, (20050000), vol. 337, pages 103 - 104 |