EP3628535 - MOBILE FRAME FOR SEATS AND RELATIVE SLIDING SEATS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lazzerini Societa' a Responsabilita' Limitata Viale Giannino Pieralisi, 21 60030 Monsano (AN) / IT | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARBONE, Innocenzo Via Enrico Mattei, 8 60030 Santa Maria Nuova (AN) / IT | 02 /
GUIDONI, Sandro Via Livorno, 3 60019 Senigallia (AN) / IT | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Ing. Claudio Baldi S.r.l. Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 19194880.1 | 02.09.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | IT20180008432 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: IT201800008432 | [2020/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628535 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3628535 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60N2/90, B60N2/005, B60N2/015, B60N2/24 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
B60N2/005 (EP);
B60N2/0722 (US);
B60N2/01508 (EP);
B60N2/01591 (EP);
B60N2/06 (US);
B60N2/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHER RAHMEN FÜR SITZE UND ENTSPRECHENDES GLEITSITZSYSTEM | [2020/14] | English: | MOBILE FRAME FOR SEATS AND RELATIVE SLIDING SEATS SYSTEM | [2020/14] | French: | CADRE MOBILE POUR SIÈGES ET SON SYSTÈME DE SIÈGES COULISSANT | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 16.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2019 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | MT | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | TR | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | IE | 02.09.2021 | LU | 02.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.09.2019 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
TR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 02.09.2019 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.09.2019 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 02.09.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 02.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19638001 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 9-14* the whole document *; | [A]US6488249 (GIRARDI PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016264023 (MILL JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |