EP3610770 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Kyuhyung LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51 Gasan Digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Minchul LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51 Gasan Digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Baekhon LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51 Gasan Digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sangsoo LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51 Gasan Digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 19195225.8 | 19.07.2016 | [2020/08] | Priority number, date | KR20150102346 | 20.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150102346 | KR20150102347 | 20.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150102347 | KR20160000981 | 05.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160000981 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610770 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A47L15/508 (EP,US);
A47L15/42 (RU);
A47L15/4217 (US);
A47L15/504 (US);
A47L15/4214 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2020/08] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2020/08] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16828038.6 / EP3197334 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0094409 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 40; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-14; | [IA]WO2010149343 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE], et al) [I] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-14; | [A]DE19926962 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * figure 3- *; | [A]JPH05146389 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-14 * figures 4,7 * |