EP3620445 - FOUNDRY BINDER MIXTURE AND FOUNDRY MOULDING MATERIAL MIXTURE FOR PRODUCING A FOUNDRY MOULD FOR PRODUCING FOUNDRY MOULDS AND CORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Bergakademie Freiberg Akademiestrasse 6 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunkel, Stephan TU Bergakademie Freiberg, Institut für Keramik Glas- und Baustofftechnik Leipziger Straße 28 09599 Freiberg / DE | 02 /
Neubert, Markus TU Bergakademie Freiberg, Institut für Keramik Glas- und Baustofftechnik Leipziger Straße 28 09599 Freiberg / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Peter TU Bergakademie Freiberg, Institut für Keramik Glas- und Baustofftechnik Leipziger Straße 28 09599 Freiberg / DE | 04 /
Erler, Harald TU Bergakademie Freiberg, Institut für Keramik Glas- und Baustofftechnik Leipziger Straße 28 09599 Freiberg / DE | 05 /
Dr. Polzin, Hartmut TU Bergakademie Freiberg, Institut für Keramik Glas- und Baustofftechnik Leipziger Straße 28 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19195266.2 | 04.09.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | DE201810121651 | 05.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018121651 | [2020/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620445 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/06, C04B28/14, B22C1/18 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
B22C1/181 (EP);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/065 (EP);
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B2111/00413 (EP);
C04B2111/0087 (EP);
C04B2111/00939 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/065, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B22/143 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B14/06, C04B22/064, C04B22/143 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B14/06, C04B22/143 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B22/143 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B7/323, C04B14/06, C04B22/064 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B7/32, C04B14/06, C04B22/064 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GIESSEREIBINDERMISCHUNG UND GIESSEREIFORMSTOFFMISCHUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GIESSEREIFORMSTOFFS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GIESSEREIFORMEN UND -KERNEN | [2020/11] | English: | FOUNDRY BINDER MIXTURE AND FOUNDRY MOULDING MATERIAL MIXTURE FOR PRODUCING A FOUNDRY MOULD FOR PRODUCING FOUNDRY MOULDS AND CORES | [2020/11] | French: | MÉLANGE DE LIANT DE FONDERIE ET MÉLANGE DE SUBSTANCE DE COULÉE DE FONDERIE DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE DE COULÉE DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION DE FORMES MOULÉES ET DE NOYAUX DE FONDERIE | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 11.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2081558 (PRANGE CHARLES H) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 17 * * column 2, line 59 - line 62 ** claims 1-6,9 *; | [XA]GB962826 (REGINALD COTTERELL BUTLER) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11 * claims 2-10 * * page 1, line 55 - line 76 * * page 2, line 11 - line 31 * * page 2, line 63 - line 76 * [A] 4; | [I]US3600203 (ALDERA ADOLFO) [I] 1,3,6-11 * column 1, line 32 - line 35 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]FR2282959 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,10 * page 25; example 3 * * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * claims 12,13 *; | [XA]DE3218446 (RIGIPS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * page 8, line 6 - page 9; examples 1,2 * [A] 4; | [XA]DE3322067 (RIGIPS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * claims 1,7,17,27 * * page 9, line 7 - line 18 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0565440 (BOULONNAIS TERRES REFRACTAIRES [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - line 29 * * claims 1,6 *; | [XA]DE19754826 (SCHWARZL KONRAD [AT]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * claims 1,4,9,10,16 * [A] 4; | [XDA]EP1785405 (CALUCEM GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,3,6 * examples 1,4 * [A] 4 | by applicant | DE520175 | DE545123 | DE683333 | DE742603 | US3155526 | DE3527978 | DD247618 | EP1785405 |