EP3637059 - SAFETY CIRCUIT AND METHOD OF TESTING A SAFETY CIRCUIT IN AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/16] | SAFETY CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR TESTING A SAFETY CIRCUIT IN AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM | ||
[2023/41] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bülow, Alexander Schaumburger Weg 17 e 31655 Stadthagen / DE | 02 /
Voß, Christian Birkhuhnweg 17 32427 Minden / DE | 03 /
Meyer, Torsten Hägeweg 23 31621 Penningsehl / DE | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolf-Christian WAGO Kontakttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Hansastraße 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 19195289.4 | 04.09.2019 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | DE20181008109 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018008109 | [2020/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637059 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3637059 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/08, H03M1/10, G01D21/00, // H03M1/12 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G01D3/08 (EP);
G01D5/16 (CN);
G01R31/31707 (US);
G01D21/00 (EP);
G01R31/282 (CN);
G01R31/31712 (US);
G01R31/318371 (US);
G05B23/0208 (US);
H03M1/1071 (EP,US);
H03M1/1076 (EP);
H03M1/124 (CN);
H03M1/1275 (US);
H03M1/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | G01D3/08, H03M1/10, G01D21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2020/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER SICHERHEITSSCHALTUNG IN EINER AUTOMATISIERUNGSANLAGE | [2020/16] | English: | SAFETY CIRCUIT AND METHOD OF TESTING A SAFETY CIRCUIT IN AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM | [2023/41] | French: | CIRCUIT DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI D'UN CIRCUIT DE SÉCURITÉ DANS UNE INSTALLATION D'AUTOMATISATION | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/16] | SAFETY CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR TESTING A SAFETY CIRCUIT IN AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 17.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2023 | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE19640937 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XAYI]JP2003114266 (OKURA DENKI CO LTD); | [XYI]DE102005030276 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]DE102013111888 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XYI]JP5927865B | by applicant | DE102005011406 | DE102011050539 | DE102013111888 |