Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11607094 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | B2 | US2023052571 | 16.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | US202217934853 | 23.09.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7487283B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2024 | B2 | JP2023041674 | 24.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019160308 | 03.09.2019 | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3942987 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | B1 | EP3942987 | 26.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | EP19195348 | 04.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11464375 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | US2020069125 | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7206171B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2023 | B2 | JP2020038665 | 12.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110870720B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2023 | B | CN110870720 | 10.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3620095 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2021 | B1 | EP3620095 | 11.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 | Type | Divisional application | EP3942987 |