EP3620095 - NAVIGATION OF AUTONOMOUS MOBILE ROBOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRITSENKO, Artem 12 Quarry Lane Malden, MA Massachusetts 02148 / US | 02 /
SCHEMBOR, Erik 2 Fayette Road Bedford, MA Massachusetts 01730 / US | 03 /
SALVATI, James R. 26 Shore Drive North Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01863 / US | 04 /
WANG, John 29 Brookfield Road Andover, MA Massachusetts 01810 / US | 05 /
DORICH, Jonathan J. 52 Fardon Street Billerica, MA Massachusetts 01821 / US | 06 /
KORDELL, Steven 100 Pleasant Str. No14 Arlington, MA Massachusetts 02476 / US | 07 /
CANAKAPALLI, Tadvana S. 329 4th Ave Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 08 /
PSARAKIS, Zacharias 15 Quarry Ln Apt. 6415 Malden, MA Massachusetts 02148 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2020/11] | 01 /
GRITSENKO, Artem 12 Quarry Lane Malden, MA Massachusetts 02148 / US | ||
02 /
SCHEMBOR, Erik 2 Fayette Road Bedford, MA Massachusetts 01730 / US | |||
03 /
SALVATI, James R. 26 Shore Drive North Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01863 / US | |||
04 /
WANG, John 29 Brookfield Road Andover, MA Massachusetts 01810 / US | |||
05 /
DORICH, Jonathan J. 52 Fardon Street Billerica, MA Massachusetts 01821 / US | |||
06 /
KORDELL, Steven 60 Pleasant Street Arlington, MA Massachusetts 02476 / US | |||
07 /
CANAKAPALLI, Tadvana S. 19 Palmer Street Arlington, MA Massachusetts 02474 / US | |||
08 /
PSARAKIS, Zacharias 15 Quarry Ln Apt. 6415 Malden, MA Massachusetts 02148 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/11] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19195348.8 | 04.09.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201816120993 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: US201816120993 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620095 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620095 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A47L9/2805 (EP,US);
A47L11/24 (CN,US);
A47L9/009 (US);
A47L11/40 (CN);
A47L11/4011 (CN,US);
A47L11/4061 (CN,US);
A47L9/2826 (EP);
A47L9/2852 (EP,US);
G05D1/0219 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | NAVIGATION VON AUTONOMEN MOBILEN ROBOTERN | [2020/11] | English: | NAVIGATION OF AUTONOMOUS MOBILE ROBOTS | [2020/11] | French: | NAVIGATION DE ROBOTS MOBILES AUTONOMES | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 03.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21180647.6 / EP3942987 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2019 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | IT | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | IE | 04.09.2021 | LU | 04.09.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 04.09.2019 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 04.09.2019 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.09.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.09.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8855914 (ALEXANDER STEVEN MATHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13,15 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 53; figures 1,4,6 *; | [X]US2015166060 (SMITH JENNIFER [US]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * paragraph [0082]; figures 10A-10E, 12A-12D *; | [A]EP3078315 (IROBOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0055]; figure 3A; claim 57 * |