Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
12.02.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
12.02.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
12.02.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
17.10.2023 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
14.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.10.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.06.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.09.2021 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
14.09.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2021 | First examination report | |
23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.08.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
21.08.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
06.09.2019 | Change - representative |