Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7542665B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2024 | B2 | JP2023062101 | 02.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2023023765 | 17.02.2023 | JP2019050991 | 19.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11520021 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2022 | B2 | US2020300985 | 24.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019050991 | 19.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7273565B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2023 | B2 | JP2020153746 | 24.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019050991 | 19.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111722239B | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B | CN111722239 | 29.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019050991 | 19.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3712644 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | B1 | EP3712644 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019050991 | 19.03.2019 |