EP3597059 - AN ELECTRICALLY HEATED SMOKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDO, Felix 22 Park Lane Old Basing Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 7HF / GB | 02 /
STAHLE, Fredrik Av. de Pra 36 1800 Vevey / CH | 03 /
CORDEY, Jean-Pierre 1, Chemin du Faug 1033 Cheseaux / CH | 04 /
MANCA, Laurent Chemin de la Butte 6 1036 Sullens / CH | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Ponder, William Anthony John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 19195729.9 | 15.04.2009 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | EP20080251450 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08251450 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597059 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A24F40/65 (EP,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (RU,US);
A24F40/46 (KR);
A24F40/50 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/53 (KR);
A24F40/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ERHITZTES RAUCHSYSTEM | [2020/04] | English: | AN ELECTRICALLY HEATED SMOKING SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FUMAGE CHAUFFÉ ÉLECTRIQUEMENT | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/26] | 18.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2023 | 22.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09732942.9 / EP2276360 | EP16195803.8 / EP3153038 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003150451 (SHAYAN SHAAHIN SEAN [US]); | [A]KR20040096110 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [X]US2005016550 (KATASE MAKOTO [JP]); | [X]US2007045288 (NELSON STEPHEN G [US]); | [X]CN101130121 (ZHIQUN WANG [CN]) | by applicant | EP0277519 | EP0295122 | EP0358002 | US5060671 | US5388594 | US5396911 | US5498855 | US5505214 | US5514630 | US5591368 | US5613505 | EP0857431 | EP0893071 | US5934289 | EP1128741 | WO03095688 | WO2004043175 | EP1618803 | US2006118128 | KR100636287B | JP2006320286 | EP1736065 | EP1736062 | WO2007066374 | WO2007077167 | WO2007078273 | WO2007131449 | WO2007131450 | WO2008015441 |