Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3594828 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3594828



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 682
26.02.2025 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
26.02.2025 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.09.2024 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.08.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.08.2024 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
21.08.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 5
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
12.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.07.2022 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
16.03.2022 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
03.01.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
03.01.2022 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.07.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.07.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
15.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.07.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
15.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.01.2020 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.12.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.10.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.10.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
08.10.2019 European search report Search / examination 8
08.10.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
30.09.2019 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
05.09.2019 Description Search / examination 186
05.09.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Drawings Search / examination 52
05.09.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
05.01.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 256