EP3620634 - VARIABLE CYCLE COMPENSATION IN A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERWILLIGER, Neil 126 Dogleg Drive Meriden, CT 06450 / US | 02 /
BENGEA, Sorin 411 Founders Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19196054.1 | 06.09.2019 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201816126200 | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US201816126200 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620634 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/20, F02C9/58, F02K1/16, F02K5/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
F02K1/16 (EP);
B64D31/00 (US);
B64D31/18 (EP);
B64D41/00 (US);
F01D15/10 (US);
F01D17/162 (US);
F02C9/20 (EP);
F02C9/58 (EP);
F02K5/00 (EP);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2220/76 (US);
F05D2260/57 (US);
F05D2260/70 (US);
F05D2260/81 (US);
F05D2270/051 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIABLE ZYKLUSKOMPENSATION IN EINEM GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2020/11] | English: | VARIABLE CYCLE COMPENSATION IN A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2020/11] | French: | COMPENSATION À CYCLE VARIABLE DANS UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 11.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013094963 (ROLT ANDREW MARTIN [GB]); | [XI]US2017058786 (STOCKWELL MARK T [GB]) |