EP3640261 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR CHRONIC ARTHRITIDES DISEASES OF CHILDHOOD-RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIZAKI, Kazuyuki 3-8-4, Midori-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo 659-0042 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMOTO, Norihiro 4-6-9-804, Nyoidani Minoo-shi Osake 562-0011 / JP | 03 /
IWAMOTO, Masahiro Utsukushigaoka 2-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 329-0207 / JP | 04 /
MINOTO, Seiji 37-7-908 Minamisenju 6-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-0003 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19196253.9 | 02.04.2002 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | JP20010103627 | 02.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001103627 | JP20010109131 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001109131 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640261 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K45/00, A61K39/395, A61P19/02 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/248 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTIKUM GEGEN CHRONISCHE ARTHRITIDEN VON KRANKHEITEN IM KINDESALTER | [2020/17] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR CHRONIC ARTHRITIDES DISEASES OF CHILDHOOD-RELATED DISEASES | [2020/17] | French: | AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR ARTHRITES CHRONIQUES DE MALADIES INFANTILES | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 21.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/39] | 07.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02708772.5 / EP1374900 | EP10011862.9 / EP2298812 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0783893 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 7, line 51 - page 8, line 15 *; | [A]EP0983767 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * column 24 - column 25 *; | [I] - DE BENEDETTI F ET AL, "Juvenile idiopathic arthritis: will etanercept be an improvement over current therapies?", BIODRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, NZ, (20000801), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1173-8804, pages 93 - 98, XP009190015 [I] 1-26 * page 93, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 96, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 97, column r, paragraph 2 * | [YA] - YOSHIZAKI K ET AL, "THERAPY OF RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS BY BLOCKING IL-6 SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION WITH A HUMANIZED ANTI-IL-6 RECEPTOR ANTIBODY", SPRINGER SEMINARS IN IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (1998), vol. 20, no. 1/2, ISSN 0172-6641, pages 247 - 259, XP001069950 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 254, paragraph 3 - page 256, paragraph 2 * [A] 16-26 | [YA] - MANGGE H ET AL, "Long-term follow-up of cytokines and soluble cytokine receptors in peripheral blood of patients with juvenile rheumatoid arthritis.", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON & CYTOKINE RESEARCH : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH SEP 1999, (199909), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 1005 - 1010, XP009104085 [Y] 1-15 * page 1005, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 1009; table 1 * [A] 16-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/107999099313217 | [A] - DE BENEDETTI F ET AL, "Is systemic juvenile rheumatoid arthritis an interleukin 6 mediated disease?", JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, TORONTO, CA, (19980201), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0315-162X, pages 203 - 207, XP009103922 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 205, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * | [A] - ARKACHAISRI T ET AL, "USE OF BIOLOGICS IN THE TREATMENT OF CHILDHOOD RHEUMATIC DISEASES", CURRENT RHEUMATOLOGY REPORTS, CURRENT SCIENCE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20000801), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1523-3774, pages 330 - 336, XP009031120 [A] 1-26 * page 330, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 332, column R, paragraph 3 - page 333, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - YILMAZ M ET AL, "Cytokine levels in serum of patients with juvenile rheumatoid arthritis.", CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY 2001, (200101), vol. 20, no. 1, ISSN 0770-3198, pages 30 - 35, XP009104083 [A] 1-26 * page 34, column R, paragraph 2 - page 35, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s100670170100 | [A] - MANGGE HARALD ET AL, "Cytokines in juvenile rheumatoid arthritis (JRA)", CYTOKINE, (199806), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 471 - 480, XP002281430 [A] 1-26 * section "Concluding remarks" last two paragraphs page 477 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.1997.0306 | [A] - MIHARA M ET AL, "HUMINIZED ANTIBODY TO HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-6 RECEPTOR INHIBITS THE DEVELOPMENT OF COLLAGEN ARTHRITIS IN CYNOMOLGUS MONKEYS", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,, US, (200103), vol. 98, no. 3, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 319 - 326, XP001069970 [A] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clim.2000.4989 | [A] - SATO K ET AL, "Reshaping a human antibody to inhibit the interleukin 6 -dependent tumor cell growth", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER REREARCH, US, (19930215), vol. 53, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 851 - 856, XP002119558 [A] 1-26 * abstract * | [A] - DE BENEDETTI FABRIZIO ET AL, "Interleukin 6 causes growth impairment in transgenic mice through a decrease in insulin-like growth factor-I: A model for stunted growth in children with chronic inflammation", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1997), vol. 99, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 643 - 650, XP002281431 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * last three paragraphs of the Discussion section page 649 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119207 | [A] - GALLAGHER K T ET AL, "JUVENILE RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS", CURRENT OPINION IN RHEUMATOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (19990101), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1040-8711, pages 372 - 376, XP009031046 [A] 1-26 * page 373, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002281-199909000-00008 | [A] - KEUL R ET AL, "A possible role for soluble IL-6 receptor in the pathogenesis of systemic onset juvenile chronic arthritis.", CYTOKINE SEP 1998, (199809), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 729 - 734, XP009104086 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 732, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.1997.0343 | [A] - FISHMAN D ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF NOVEL POLYMORPHISMS IN THE INTERLEUKIN-6 (IL-6) GENE ON IL-6 TRANSCRIPTION AND PLASMA IL-6 LEVELS AND AN ASSOCIATION WITH SYSTEMIC-ONSET JUVENILE CHRONIC ARTHRITIS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19981001), ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1369 - 1376, XP002952078 [A] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI2629 | [A] - ELLIOTT M J ET AL, "SUPPRESSION OF FEVER AND THE ACUTE-PHASE RESPONSE IN A PATIENT WITH JUVENILE CHRONIC ARTHRITIS TREATED WITH MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR-ALPHA (CA2)", BRITISH JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (19970101), vol. 36, doi:10.1093/RHEUMATOLOGY/36.5.589, ISSN 0263-7103, pages 589 - 593, XP002953580 [A] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/36.5.589 | [A] - ELLIOTT M J ET AL, "Treatment of systemic juvenile chronic arthritis (JCA) with monoclonal anti-TNF-alpha: Temporary control of systemic but not articular features of disease", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, & 58TH NATIONAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY AND THE 29TH NATIONAL SCIEN; MINNEAPOLIS, MINNESOTA, USA; OCTOBER 23-27, 1994, (1994), vol. 37, no. 9 SUPPL., ISSN 0004-3591, page S276, XP009109042 [A] 1-26 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0125023 | EP0239400 | EP0325474 | JPH02188600 | EP0411946 | JPH03139293 | JPH03155795 | JPH03219894 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9219759 | WO9220791 | WO9306213 | US5210075 | US5216128 | WO9311236 | WO9312227 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | FR2694767 | WO9411523 | WO9425585 | WO9501438 | WO9509873 | WO9515388 | JPH07324097 | WO9617869 | WO9618648 | WO9630394 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571513 | JPH08291199 | JPH08311098 | - HIRANO, T. et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 324, pages 73 - 76 | - AKIRA, S. et al., Adv. in Immunology, (19930000), vol. 54, pages 1 - 78 | - LOTZ, M. et al., J. Exp. Med., (19880000), vol. 167, pages 1253 - 1258 | - TAGA T. et al., J. Exp. Med., (19870000), vol. 166, pages 967 - 981 | - YAMASAKI, K. et al., Science, (19870000), vol. 241, pages 825 - 828 | - TAGA et al., Cell, (19890000), vol. 58, pages 573 - 581 | - NOVICK D. et al., Hybridoma, (19910000), vol. 10, pages 137 - 146 | - HUANG, Y.W. et al., Hybridoma, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 621 - 630 | - HIRATA et al., "one of anti-IL-6 receptor antibodies", J. Immunology, (19890000), vol. 143, pages 2900 - 2906 | - FINK CW, "Proposal for the development of classification criteria for idiopathic arthritides of childhood", J. Rheumatol., (19950000), vol. 22, page 1566 | - SOUTHWOOD TR, "Classifying childhood arthritis", Ann. Rheum. Dis., (19970000), vol. 56, page 79 | - SHUNPEI YOKOTA, "Advances in recent therapeutic methods for chronic arthritides diseases of childhood", Rheumatism, (19990000), vol. 39, page 860 | - YAMAGUCHI, Journal of Rheumatology, (19920000), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 424 - 30 | - Seminars in Arthritis & Rheumatism, (19870000), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 39 - 57 | - GOLDMAN, Southern Medical Journal, (19800000), vol. 73, pages 555 - 563 | - Arthritis Rheum., (19910000), vol. 34, page 1158 | - J. Clin. Invest., (19940000), vol. 93, page 2114 | - Br. J. Rheumatol., (19950000), vol. 34, page 454 | - MATSUDA et al., Eur. J. Immunology, (19880000), vol. 18, pages 951 - 956 | - BIRD, R.E. et al., TI BTECH, (19910000), vol. 21, pages 132 - 137 | - Eur. J. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 168, pages 543 - 550 | - MATSUDA, T. et al., J. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 140, pages 1534 - 1541 | - Agr. Biol. Chem., (19900000), vol. 54, pages 2685 - 2688 | - TAMURA, T. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 11924 - 11928 | - HIRATA, Y. et al., J. Immunology, (19890000), vol. 143, pages 2900 - 2906 | - YASUKAWA et al., Biochem., (19900000), vol. 108, pages 673 - 676 | - KEARNEY, J.F. et al., J. Immunol., (19790000), vol. 123, pages 1548 - 1550 | - Current Topics in Microbiology and Immunology, (19780000), vol. 81, pages 1 - 7 | - KOHLER, G.MILSTEIN, C., Eur. J. Immunol., (19760000), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519 | - MARGULIES, D.H. et al., Cell, (19760000), vol. 8, pages 405 - 415 | - SHULMAN, M. et al., Nature, (19780000), vol. 276, pages 269 - 270 | - DE ST. GROTH, S.F. et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19800000), vol. 35, pages 1 - 21 | - TROWBRIDGE, I.S., J. Exp. Med., (19780000), vol. 148, pages 313 - 323 | - MULLIGAN, R.C. et al., Nature, (19790000), vol. 277, pages 108 - 114 | - KOHLER, G.MILSTEIN, C., Methods Enzymol., (19810000), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46 | - MIZUSHIMA, S.NAGATA, S., Nucleic Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 5322 | - CHIRGWIN, J.M. et al., Biochemistry, (19790000), vol. 18, pages 5294 - 5299 | - CHOMCZYNSKI, P. et al., Anal. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159 | - FROHMAN, M.A. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - BELYAVSKY, A. et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 2919 - 2932 | - SATO, K. et al., Cancer Res., (19930000), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - WARD, E.S. et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - WARD, E.S. et al., FASEB J., (19920000), vol. 6, pages 2422 - 2427 | - BETTER, M. et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 241, pages 1041 - 1043 | - LEI, S.P. et al., J. Bacteriol., (19870000), vol. 169, pages 4379 - 4383 | - EBERT, K.M. et al., Bio/Technology, (19940000), vol. 12, pages 699 - 702 | - MAEDA, S. et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 315, pages 592 - 594 | - JULIAN,K.-C. MA et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 131 - 138 | - CO, M.S. et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - PLUCKTRUN, A.SKERRA, A., Methods Enzymol., (19890000), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - ROUSSEAUX, J. et al., Methods Enzymol., (19860000), vol. 121, pages 663 - 669 | - VRIEND et al., J. Mol. Graphics, vol. 8, no. 11990, pages 52 - 56 | - BRAKENHOFF et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 86 - 93 | - SAVIONO et al., EMBO J., (19940000), vol. 13, pages 1357 - 1367 | - SAITO, T. et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 168 - 173 | - URLAUB, G. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - CHEN, C. et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19870000), vol. 7, pages 2745 - 2751 | - HIRANO et al., Immunol. Lett., (19880000), vol. 17, pages 41 - 45 | - HIRATA, Y. et al., J. Immunol., (19890000), vol. 143, pages 19080 - 2906 |