Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021037982 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962893692 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196546 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196537 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196536 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196542 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196541 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196543 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893704 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196540 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893702 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893686 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893698 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893696 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893694 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022175050 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962893692 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196546 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196537 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196536 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196542 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196541 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196543 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893704 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196540 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893702 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893686 | 29.08.2019 | WO2020EP73978 | 27.08.2020 | US201962893698 | 29.08.2019 | US202217677466 | 22.02.2022 | US201962893696 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893694 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4021216 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962893692 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196546 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196537 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196536 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196542 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196541 | 10.09.2019 | EP19196543 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893704 | 29.08.2019 | EP19196540 | 10.09.2019 | US201962893702 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893686 | 29.08.2019 | WO2020EP73978 | 27.08.2020 | US201962893698 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893696 | 29.08.2019 | US201962893694 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791740 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196546 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791737 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196543 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791736 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196541 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791735 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196537 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791733 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196540 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791732 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196536 | 10.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3791734 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19196542 | 10.09.2019 |