EP3608322 - SYRINGE CONTAINING NMTX BROMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bazhina, Nataliya 7 Carol Lane Tappan, NY New York 10983 / US | 02 /
Donato, George Joseph 517 Michigan Avenue Swarthmore, PA Pennsylvania 19081 / US | 03 /
Fabian, Steven R. 15 Periwinkle Drive Barnegat, NJ New Jersey 08005 / US | 04 /
Lokhnauth, John 14-11 Prospect Avenue Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US | 05 /
Megati, Sreenivasulu 1 Hearth Court New City, NY 10956 / US | 06 /
Melucci, Charles 37 Liberty Drive Highland Mills, NY 10930 / US | 07 /
Ofslager, Christian 4 Rockwood Drive Newburgh, NY 12550 / US | 08 /
Patel, Niketa 47 Windsor Drive Lincoln Park, NJ 07035 / US | 09 /
Radebaugh, Galen 41 South Road Chester, NJ 07930 / US | 10 /
Shah, Syed M. 15897 Double Eagle Trail Delray Beach, FL 33446 / US | 11 /
Szeliga, Jan 150 Whalehead Road Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | 12 /
Zhang, Huyi 8 Donaldson Lane Garnerville, NY 10923 / US | 13 /
Zhu, Tianmin 5 Whitman Place Monroe, NY 10950 / US | [2020/37] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
Bazhina, Nataliya 7 Carol Lane Tappan, NY New York 10983 / US | ||
02 /
Donato, George Joseph 517 Michigan Avenue Swarthmore, PA Pennsylvania 19081 / US | |||
03 /
Fabian, Steven R. 15 Periwinkle Drive Barnegat, NJ New Jersey 08005 / US | |||
04 /
Lokhnauth, John 14-11 Prospect Avenue Fair Lawn, NJ New Jersey 07410 / US | |||
05 /
Megati, Sreenivasulu 1 Hearth Court New City, NY New York 10956 / US | |||
06 /
Melucci, Charles 37 Liberty Drive Highland Mills, NY New York 10930 / US | |||
07 /
Ofslager, Christian 4 Rockwood Drive Newburgh, NY New York 12550 / US | |||
08 /
Patel, Niketa 47 Windsor Drive Lincoln Park, NJ New Jersey 07035 / US | |||
09 /
Radebaugh, Galen 41 South Road Chester, NJ New Jersey 07930 / US | |||
10 /
Shah, Syed M. 15897 Double Eagle Trail Delray Beach, FL 33446 / US | |||
11 /
Szeliga, Jan 41 Irving Avenue Croton on Hudson, NY New York 10520 / US | |||
12 /
Zhang, Huyi 8 Donaldson Lane Garnerville, NY New York 10923 / US | |||
13 /
Zhu, Tianmin 5 Whitman Place Monroe, NY New York 10950 / US | |||
Former [2020/07] | 01 /
Bazhina, Nataliya 7 Carol Lane Tappan, NY New York 10983 / US | ||
02 /
Donato, George Joseph 517 Michigan Avenue Swarthmore, PA Pennsylvania 19081 / US | |||
03 /
Fabian, Steven R. 15 Periwinkle Drive Barnegat, NJ New Jersey 08005 / US | |||
04 /
Lokhnauth, John 14-11 Prospect Avenue Fair Lawn, NJ New Jersey 07410 / US | |||
05 /
Megati, Sreenivasulu 1 Hearth Court New City, NY New York 10956 / US | |||
06 /
Melucci, Charles 37 Liberty Drive Highland Mills, NY New York 10930 / US | |||
07 /
Ofslager, Christian 4 Rockwood Drive Newburgh, NY New York 12550 / US | |||
08 /
Patel, Niketa 47 Windsor Drive Lincoln Park, NJ New Jersey 07035 / US | |||
09 /
Radebaugh, Galen 41 South Road Chester, NJ New Jersey 07930 / US | |||
10 /
Shah, Syed M. 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ New Jersey 07936 / US | |||
11 /
Szeliga, Jan 41 Irving Avenue Croton on Hudson, NY New York 10520 / US | |||
12 /
Zhang, Huyi 8 Donaldson Lane Garnerville, NY New York 10923 / US | |||
13 /
Zhu, Tianmin 5 Whitman Place Monroe, NY New York 10950 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Parchmann, Stefanie Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19197036.7 | 30.09.2009 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US20080101201P | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 101201 P | US20090226581P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226581 P | US20090237428P | 27.08.2009 Original published format: US 237428 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608322 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608322 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D489/08, A61K31/485 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,US);
C07D489/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D221/28 (CN);
A61D7/00 (CN);
A61J1/05 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61M5/178 (CN,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.08.2020 | BA | 10.08.2020 | RS | 10.08.2020 | Title | German: | SPRITZE DIE NMTX BROMID ENTHÄLT | [2020/07] | English: | SYRINGE CONTAINING NMTX BROMIDE | [2020/07] | French: | SYRINGUE CONTENANT LA NMTX BROMIDE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 10.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09740568.2 / EP2356119 | EP14154611.9 / EP2786997 | Divisional application(s) | EP22168111.7 / EP4071151 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | CY | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | TR | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | LU | 30.09.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006127898 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 63, line 1 - line 8; claim 1 *; | [ID]WO2006127899 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-15* page 15, line 11 - line 16; example 6 *; | [ID]WO2008019115 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Paragraphs [018], [027], [028], [038];; examples 8,10 * | by applicant | US4176186 | US2004266806 | US2005124657 | WO2006127899 | WO2008019115 | US2008070975 | US2008103438 | - KOCH, T. R et al., Digestive Diseases and Sciences, (19910000), vol. 36, pages 712 - 728 | - SCHULLER, A.G.P. et al., Society of Neuroscience Abstracts, (19980000), vol. 24, page 524 | - REISINE, T.PASTERNAK, G., Goodman & Oilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (19960000), pages 521 - 555 | - BAGNOL, D. et al., Regul. Pept., (19930000), vol. 47, pages 259 - 273 | - Remingtons Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Company, (19850000), vol. 4 | - Design and Application of Prodrugs, Textbook of Drug Design and Development, (19910000), vol. 5, pages 113 - 191 | - BUNDGAARD et al., Journal of Drag Delivery Reviews, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - BUNDGAAR , J., Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19880000), vol. 77, page 285 | - WANG et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical and Biomedical Analysis, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 937 - 943 |