EP3636520 - BALLASTING DEVICE AND AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Letscher, Jens John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Riemer, Thorben John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Stein, Stefan John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 19197281.9 | 13.09.2019 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | DE201810217286 | 10.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018217286 | [2020/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636520 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636520 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D49/06, B62D37/04 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B62D49/0628 (EP,US);
B62D49/085 (US);
B62D37/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | B62D49/06, B62D49/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BALLASTIERVORRICHTUNG UND LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES FAHRZEUG | [2020/16] | English: | BALLASTING DEVICE AND AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE | [2020/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALLASTAGE ET VÉHICULE AGRICOLE | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2019 | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | IE | 13.09.2021 | LU | 13.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.09.2019 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.09.2019 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 13.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2815319 (DEFRANCQ HUBERT [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2010071380 (DOOSAN INFRACORE CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract * | by applicant | EP2186713 |