EP3623839 - LIDAR CAMERA SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 2730 West Tyvola Road Four Coliseum Centre Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, James B. 28 Oak Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | 02 /
HUMPHREY, Ian Peter 37 Pine Acres Road Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19197398.1 | 13.09.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | US201816131747 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US201816131747 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623839 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S17/89 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (US);
G02B26/12 (US);
G02B27/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIDAR-KAMERASYSTEME | [2020/12] | English: | LIDAR CAMERA SYSTEMS | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CAMÉRA LIDAR | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013293681 (BOROWSKI ANDRE [CH]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] , [0067] *; | [XYI]US2017350983 (HALL DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0048] - [0050] - [0083] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 8-11; | [A]US2018081094 (AIKIN RANDOL W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0016] , [0049] * |