EP3598803 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF MANAGING STORED SYSTEM INFORMATION USING VALIDLY TIMER WHEN APPLYING DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION MODE IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Soenghun c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
van der Velde, Himke c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sangbum c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jang, Jaehyuk c/o 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 19197516.8 | 12.08.2016 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | US201562204315P | 12.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562204315 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598803 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598803 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W4/70, H04W76/28, // H04W48/12 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
H04L67/62 (KR);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG GESPEICHERTER SYSTEMINFORMATIONEN MIT GÜLTIGEM ZEITGEBER BEI ANWENDUNG EINES DISKONTINUIERLICHEN EMPFANGSBETRIEBS IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2020/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF MANAGING STORED SYSTEM INFORMATION USING VALIDLY TIMER WHEN APPLYING DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION MODE IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS SYSTÈME MÉMORISÉES AU MOYEN D'UN TEMPORISATEUR VALIDE LORS DE L'APPLICATION D'UN MODE DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 01.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16835485.0 / EP3335475 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2016 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IE | 12.08.2021 | LU | 12.08.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 12.08.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.08.2016 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 12.08.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 12.08.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 12.08.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 12.08.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.08.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011199950 (KLINGENBRUNN THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,14 * par. 9, 50-59 * [I] 2-5,7-10,12,13,15; | [XI]EP2493223 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,5,6,10,11,14 * Paragraphs [0001], [0005], [0006], [0010], [0012], [0013], [0018]-[0023], [0026], [0027], [0029]-[0038], [0041]-[0045] * [I] 2-4,7-9,12,13,15; | [XI] - MOTOROLA, "System Information Change during Connection Setup Procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-084212, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080812), no. Jeju; 20080812, XP050319335 [X] 1,6,11,14 * Sections 8.5.48, 8.5.49 and 8.5.49a * [I] 2-5,7-10,12,13,15 | [A] - NOKIA NETWORKS, "Initial considerations on solutions for improving coverage of the PCCH channel", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20150209 - 20150213, (20150208), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-150640, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150208), XP050933842 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Broadcasting access control actions for NW assigned groups", vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140322), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-141271, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_85bis/Docs/, (20140322), XP050817795 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "RRC signalling support for SIB-1 acquisition in FeICIC", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20120812 - 20120818, (20120807), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-123582_SIB1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_79/Docs/, (20120807), XP050665618 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - SAMSUNG, "SI update in the extneded IDLE DRX", vol. RAN WG2, no. Beijing; 20150824 - 20150828, (20150815), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-153440, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_91/Docs/, (20150815), XP050992919 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * |