EP3639952 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS AND METHODS INCLUDING LOUVERED PARTICULATE CONTAINMENT WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madelone, Jr., John Joseph c/o General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Susong, Adam G. c/o General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Wilhelm, Timothy Joseph c/o General Electric Company 1297 Thacher Park Road East Berne, NY New York 12059 / US | 04 /
Martin, Andrew J. c/o General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 05 /
Lowe, Donald Dana c/o General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/21] |
Former [2020/17] | Hafner & Kohl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19197781.8 | 17.09.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201816163121 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: US201816163121 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639952 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639952 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/28, B22F10/47, B22F12/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/255, B29C64/35, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/20, B29C64/00, B22F10/30, // B22F10/73 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
B29C64/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/20 (US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (US);
B29C64/245 (US);
B29C64/255 (US);
B29C64/35 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B22F10/385 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F10/73 (EP,US);
B22F12/222 (EP,US);
B22F12/224 (EP,US);
B22F12/49 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | B22F10/28, B22F10/47, B22F12/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/255, B29C64/35, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/20, // B22F10/73 | ||
Former IPC [2020/17] | B22F3/105, B29C64/153, B29C64/255, B29C64/35, B29C64/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG MIT LAMELLENARTIGER PARTIKELBEHÄLTERWAND | [2020/17] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS AND METHODS INCLUDING LOUVERED PARTICULATE CONTAINMENT WALL | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE COMPRENANT UNE PAROI DE CONFINEMENT PARTICULAIRE À PERSIENNES | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2019 | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | CY | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | MK | 25.05.2022 | MT | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | TR | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IE | 17.09.2022 | LU | 17.09.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
TR | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3053720 (WERKZEUGBAU SIEGFRIED HOFMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0062] * * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2017194144 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0082] ** figure 5 * |