EP3657461 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 8571 / JP | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNO, Satoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19197819.6 | 17.09.2019 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | JP20180179973 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018179973 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657461 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G08G1/048, G08G1/00, B60W40/09, B60W40/105, B60W40/107, B60W40/109, B60W40/114 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G08G1/0112 (EP);
B60W30/08 (CN);
G07C5/085 (US);
B60T7/22 (CN);
B60T8/1761 (CN);
B60W30/09 (CN);
B60W40/09 (EP);
B60W50/02 (CN);
G07C5/008 (US);
G08G1/0129 (EP);
G08G1/048 (EP);
G08G1/165 (CN);
G08G1/166 (CN);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND -SERVER | [2020/22] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND SERVER | [2020/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SERVEUR | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010217486 (TAGUCHI KOJI [JP]); | [XAYI]US2017183015 (PHELAN JOSEPH PATRICK [AU], et al); | [A]US2018037221 (MYERS SCOTT VINCENT [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2013544695 |