EP3637542 - MINIATURE SLOW-WAVE TRANSMISSION LINE WITH ASYMMETRICAL GROUND AND ASSOCIATED PHASE SHIFTER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices International Unlimited Company Bay F1 Raheen Industrial Estate Co. Limerick Limerick / IE | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Xudong 9717 Summit Ash Ct Colorado Springs, Colorado 80920 / US | 02 /
Bagwell, Michael W. 4350 Star Ranch Rd. Colorado Springs, Colorado 80906 / US | 03 /
Beckwith, William B. 15450 S. Perry Park Road Larkspur, Colorado 80118 / US | 04 /
Schiltz, Thomas E. 20050 Soaring Wing Drive Colorado Springs, Colorado 80908 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/16] | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19197846.9 | 17.09.2019 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | US201862745272P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745272 P | US201916294743 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: US201916294743 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637542 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3637542 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/18, H01P9/00, // H01P3/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
H01P1/184 (EP);
H01P3/00 (CN);
H01J23/24 (US);
H01P1/182 (CN);
H01P3/003 (US);
H01P9/00 (EP,CN);
H01P9/006 (CN);
H01Q1/46 (US);
H01Q3/36 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MINIATUR-SLOW-WAVE-ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNG MIT ASYMMETRISCHER MASSE UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN PHASENSCHIEBERSYSTEMEN | [2020/16] | English: | MINIATURE SLOW-WAVE TRANSMISSION LINE WITH ASYMMETRICAL GROUND AND ASSOCIATED PHASE SHIFTER SYSTEMS | [2020/16] | French: | LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION D'ONDES LENTES MINIATURE AVEC TERRE ASYMÉTRIQUE ET SYSTÈMES DE DÉPHASEUR ASSOCIÉS | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 21.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005040915 (RYU HAN CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 6* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0043]; figure 3A *; | [Y]US7570133 (TAFT WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 8-15 * columns 1, 7 - column 10; figures 1, 5, 8 *; | [Y]US2013154773 (SIPRAK DOMAGOJ [DE]) [Y] 7,11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraphs [0044] , [0 81]; figures 1A-2D *; | [XI] - KOMIJAM A ET AL, "A 24GHz, +14.5dBm fury-integrated power amplifier in 0.18 micro m CMOS", CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 2004, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041003), doi:10.1109/CICC.2004.1358884, ISBN 978-0-7803-8495-8, pages 561 - 564, XP010742378 [X] 1-4 * page 561 - page 562; figures 2, 3 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CICC.2004.1358884 | [XY] - HENG-CHIA HSU ET AL, "U-shaped slow-wave transmission lines in 0.18 micro m CMOS", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. ISCAS 2010 - 30 MAY-2 JUNE 2010 - PARIS, FRANCE, IEEE, US, (20100530), ISBN 978-1-4244-5308-5, pages 1296 - 1299, XP031724498 [X] 1 * chapters I and III;; figure 3 * [Y] 7-15 | [A] - T. KITAZAWA ET AL, "Quasi-Static Characteristics of Asymmetrical and Coupled Coplanar-Type Transmission Lines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, USA, (19850901), vol. 33, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TMTT.1985.1133125, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 771 - 778, XP055666212 [A] 4,5,15 * chapters I and II;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.1985.1133125 |