EP3626364 - CONDUIT SECTION AND MOLD DEVICE WITH THE CONDUIT SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS group GmbH Am SMS Campus 1 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states SMS Group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmeister, Jörn Eichenstraße 113 47443 Moers / DE | 02 /
Dreis, Michael Schulstraße 10a 47199 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
Snadny, Ulrich Stimbergstraße 66 45739 Oer-Erkenschwick / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19197890.7 | 17.09.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | DE201810215815 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018215815 | DE201810220203 | 23.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018220203 | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626364 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3626364 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/05, B22D11/055, B22D11/057, E03C1/02 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B22D11/05 (EP);
B22D11/055 (EP);
B22D11/057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEITUNGSABSCHNITT UND KOKILLENEINRICHTUNG MIT DEM LEITUNGSABSCHNITT | [2020/13] | English: | CONDUIT SECTION AND MOLD DEVICE WITH THE CONDUIT SECTION | [2020/13] | French: | SECTION DE CONDUITE ET DISPOSITIF DE LINGOTIÈRE DOTÉE DE LA SECTION DE CONDUITE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 08.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.03.2022
30.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT Opponent's representative Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2022/18] | 13.04.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2019 | AL | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | TR | 30.06.2021 | IE | 17.09.2021 | LU | 17.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | FR | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | GB | 17.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
TR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6164570 (SMELTZER STEVE NORMAN [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 43; figures 1, 2, 12 * [A] 10,11,13-16 [I] 3,5-9,12; | [XI]KR100779577B (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [I] 2-9,11,12; | [A]EP2321075 (SMS SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0022] * | Examination | JPS579564 | by applicant | DE102006057242 | Opposition | DE102008057888 | DE2047347 | US4776617 | US6973957 | KR20070005047 | DE102009011849 | CN201284892Y | US3427051 | DE1811156 | - Beitz W, Kuttner K H, "Dubbel Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau. 16. Auflage. Auszug", Springer Verlag, (19870101), pages G74 - G74, XP055909030 |