EP3628194 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Coffee Service F.V. Eichenhain N. 6 35641 Schoffengrund-Laufdorf / DE | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vettorel, Fabio Global Coffee Service F.V. Eichenhain N. 6 35641 Schoffengrund-Laufdorf / DE | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Citron, Massimiliano Via Primo Maggio, 6 31020 San Fior (TV) / IT | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 19198827.8 | 22.09.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | IT20180008959 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: IT201800008959 | [2020/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628194 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A47J31/4489 (EP);
A47J31/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GETRÄNKEN | [2020/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING BEVERAGES | [2020/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE BOISSONS | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 25.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2009139324 (MORIMOTO HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [IA]EP2389848 (GRUPPO CIMBALI SPA [IT]); | [XA]US2012293332 (ROSENFELD ABRAHAM [US]); | [XAI]WO2015042652 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU]) | by applicant | WO2015042652 | EP2878241 |