Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11065507 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020101352 | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW107213231 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3224275U | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | U | Priority number | Date | TW107213231 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3628378 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2021 | B1 | EP3628378 | 01.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW107213231 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWM574502U | 21.02.2019 | U | Priority number | Date | TW107213231 | 28.09.2018 |