EP3607980 - SUBSTANCE DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TG Medwise Ltd. 26 Alexander HaGadol Street 4524066 Hod HaSharon / IL | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Tal c/o TG MEDWISE LTD 26 Alexander HaGadol Street 4524066 Hod HaSharon / IL | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19199052.2 | 13.08.2013 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US201261682317P | 13.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261682317 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607980 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/152, A61M5/142, A01K13/00, A01K27/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61M5/1452 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/14224 (EP,CN,US);
A61D7/00 (US);
A01K13/003 (EP,US);
A01K27/007 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/14248 (US);
A61M5/16818 (US);
A61M5/445 (US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3331 (US);
A61M2205/3368 (US);
A61M2205/3584 (US);
A61M2205/3592 (US);
A61M2205/3606 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3633 (US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3673 (US);
A61M2205/581 (US);
A61M2205/587 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (US);
A61M2250/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SUBSTANZABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | SUBSTANCE DELIVERY DEVICE | [2020/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE DE SUBSTANCES | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 05.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13774533.7 / EP2882473 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9902208 (PETS N PEOPLE LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,67,68 * * figures 1-3,6 *; | [I]US2006271020 (HUANG JOSEPH Z [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-30 * * figures 1-19 *; | [A]WO2008002917 (CYBERKINETICS NEUROTECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]WO2012106678 (TRIA BEAUTY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 54 * |