EP3798199 - FERTILIZER COMPRISING PHOSPHATE ROCK POWDER AND SURFACE-REACTED CALCIUM CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozyhar, Tomasz Breitacherstrasse 2 CH-8142 Uitikon / CH | 02 /
HiltyVancura, Florentine Bergstrasse 95 CH-8706 Meilen / CH | 03 /
Sibik, Svetlana Dornacherstrasse 14 4001 Basel / CH | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19199883.0 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798199 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C05B17/00, C05D3/02 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C05B17/00 (EP);
C05G1/00 (US);
C05B13/02 (US);
C05D3/02 (EP,US);
C05G3/50 (US);
C05G3/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNGEMITTEL MIT PHOSPHATSTEINPULVER UND OBERFLÄCHENREAGIERTEM CALCIUMCARBONAT | [2021/13] | English: | FERTILIZER COMPRISING PHOSPHATE ROCK POWDER AND SURFACE-REACTED CALCIUM CARBONATE | [2021/13] | French: | ENGRAIS COMPRENANT DE LA POUDRE DE ROCHE PHOSPHATÉE ET DU CARBONATE DE CALCIUM TRAITÉ PAR RÉACTION EN SURFACE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006010946 (MAYHEW LAWRENCE [US], et al); | [Y]EP3045042 (OMYA INT AG [CH]); | [XI]EP3216510 (OMYA INT AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2017210768 (AVALON ALLIANCE INC [CA]) | by applicant | WO0039222 | US2004020410 | WO2004083316 | WO2005121257 | WO2009074492 | EP2264108 | EP2264109 |