EP3629556 - SENSOR DEVICE, SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melexis Technologies SA Chemin de Buchaux 38 2022 Bevaix / CH | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Melexis Technologies SA Chemin de Buchaux 38 2022 Bevaix / CH | ||
Former [2020/14] | For all designated states Melexis Technologies SA Chemin de Buchaux 38 2022 Bevaix / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POEZART, Mathieu Melexis Technologies SA Rue de la Reusière 5 2024 Saint-Aubin-Sauges / CH | 02 /
LAZAR, Zsombor Melexis Technologies SA Engelhardstrasse 62 3280 Murten / CH | 03 /
DUISTERS, Antonius Melexis Technologies SA Kreuzmattweg 31 1712 Tafers / CH | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/44] | Jacobs, Lambert Inventrans BV Overwegstraat 24 3740 Bilzen / BE | ||
Former [2020/14] | LC Patents Kempische Steenweg 542A 3500 Hasselt / BE | Application number, filing date | 19200098.2 | 27.09.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | EP20180197393 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18197393 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629556 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3629556 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3629556 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP);
G01R33/02 (CN);
G01D5/24409 (US);
G01D5/24476 (US);
G01R33/022 (CN);
G01R33/07 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2020/14] | English: | SENSOR DEVICE, SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD | [2020/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2022
04.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Molnia, David Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2022/36] | 18.08.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.01.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.12.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2019 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | ES | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | IT | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | MT | 03.11.2021 | NL | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | IE | 27.09.2022 | LU | 27.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | GB | 27.09.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/33] | HU | 27.09.2019 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 27.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.09.2019 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 27.09.2019 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.09.2019 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015213706 (BAI JIE [JP], et al); | [A]US2016334437 (NISHIDA MASAFUMI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2018164125 (DAKSHINAMURTHY SRIRAMAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2017163366 | EP20180153346 | Opposition | US2016282116 | US2017163366 | US2018164125 |