EP3633331 - MONITORING MACHINE VIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bently Nevada, LLC 1631 Bently Parkway South Minden, NV 89423 / US | [2023/08] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Bently Nevada, LLC 1631 Bently Parkway South Minden, NV 89423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIGH, Nigel Trevor 1631 Bently Parkway Minden, NV 89423 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2020/15] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Baker Hughes, A GE Company The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19200284.8 | 27.09.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | US201816148449 | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US201816148449 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633331 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3633331 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/00, G01H1/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G01H1/003 (EP);
G01M13/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | MASCHINENVIBRATIONSÜBERWACHUNG | [2020/15] | English: | MONITORING MACHINE VIBRATION | [2020/15] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DES VIBRATIONS DES MACHINES | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | GB | 27.09.2023 | IE | 27.09.2023 | LU | 27.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
GB | 27.09.2023 | ||
IE | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 27.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
GB | 27.09.2023 | ||
IE | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 27.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 27.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP1405047 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0161]; figures 1,8,17; table 2 * [A] 7-9 [Y] 4-6,10-12 [I] 13; | [Y]EP2378382 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 4-6,10-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030]; figure 3 *; | [A]CN107239739 (UNIV BEIJING CHEM TECH) [A] 14* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US5895857 |