EP3693639 - FUEL METERING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERRY, Erin E. 8036 Bond Drive Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/33] | 01 /
BERRY, Erin E. 8036 Bond Drive Roscoe, IL Illinois 61073 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 19200555.1 | 30.09.2019 | [2020/33] | Priority number, date | US201816148477 | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US201816148477 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693639 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693639 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/07, F16K37/00, F02C7/232 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
F02C7/232 (EP,US);
F02C9/263 (US);
F16K11/07 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP);
F16K37/0083 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2270/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFDOSIERUNGSEINHEIT | [2020/33] | English: | FUEL METERING UNIT | [2020/33] | French: | UNITÉ DE MESURE DE CARBURANT | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 12.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23169871.3 / EP4219987 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5826616 (GOLDEN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004221896 (BALLENGER DEVANE R [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; figure 10 *; | [Y]US2006174948 (CARUSO ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2014069102 (SATIENPOCH MONTIRA [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0025] , [0026]; figures 2B,3A *; | [A]US9303784 (BALLARD PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 21-67; figure 2 * |