EP3628848 - DIFFERENTIAL GEARED AMPLIFICATION OF AUXILIARY POWER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/14] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUPRATIS, Daniel Bernard 12 Sunset Dr. Wallingford, CT Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
TERWILLIGER, Neil 126 Dogleg Dr. Meriden, CT Connecticut 06450 / US | 03 /
ROMERO, Michael M. 103 North St. Manchester, CT Connecticut 06042 / US | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 19200614.6 | 30.09.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | US201816145431 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US201816145431 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628848 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/277, F02C7/32, F02C7/36, F16H37/08 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
F02C7/277 (EP);
F02C7/32 (EP,US);
B64D13/02 (EP);
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F05D2220/50 (EP,US);
F05D2260/40311 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIALGETRIEBEVERSTÄRKUNG EINES HILFSTRIEBWERKS | [2020/14] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL GEARED AMPLIFICATION OF AUXILIARY POWER UNIT | [2020/14] | French: | AMPLIFICATION À ENGRENAGE DIFFÉRENTIEL D'UNE UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION AUXILIAIRE | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 01.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2010024434 (MOORE GARETH E [GB], et al); | [A]US2016348788 (LEMMERS JR GLENN C [US], et al); | [A]US2017284408 (RICORDEAU JULIEN ALEXIS LOUIS [FR], et al) |