EP3634097 - TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR RETAINING A COMPONENT TO A SURFACE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harwin PLC Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBBER, Robert c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | 02 /
BENNETT, Sam c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | 03 /
HUNT, Kevin c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | 04 /
PANTER, Robert c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | 05 /
PLESTED, Mark c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | 06 /
MCQUILKEN, Andrew c/o Harwin PLC, Fitzherbert Road, Farlington Fitzherbert Road Farlington Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1RT / GB | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Patel, Nikesh, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Patel, Nikesh, et al AA Thornton IP LLP Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | ||
Former [2020/15] | Patel, Nikesh, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19200737.5 | 01.10.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | GB20180015992 | 01.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201815992 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3634097 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3634097 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634097 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
H05K9/0035 (EP,GB,US);
H05K3/341 (US);
H05K7/12 (US);
H05K7/1405 (US);
H05K7/1417 (US);
H05K9/0009 (US);
H05K9/0028 (GB);
H05K1/0216 (EP);
H05K2201/1031 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLEMME UND VERFAHREN ZUM HALTEN EINES BAUTEILS AN EINER OBERFLÄCHE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/15] | English: | TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR RETAINING A COMPONENT TO A SURFACE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/15] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RETENIR UN COMPOSANT SUR UNE SURFACE ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 09.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6051781 (BIANCA GIUSEPPE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,13 * abstract * * figures 1,3,6,8 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, lines 8-49 * * column 4, lines 44-67 * * column 5, lines 1-41 * [Y] 11,12[I] 14-20; | [XYI]US7876579 (TSAU CHANG-JIE [TW]) [X] 1-4,7-9,13 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * column 2, lines 8-29 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 5,6,14-20; | [XYI]JP2011198839 (AUTO SPLICE KK) [X] 1-4,7-10,13 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0004] , [0006] , [0018] , [0024] - [0037] * [Y] 11,12 [I] 5,6,14-20; | [XYI]US2013148318 (KIM SUN-KI [KR]) [X] 2-4,7,8,13 * abstract * * figures 7a-7d * * paragraphs [0081] - [0089] * [Y] 11,12 [I] 1,5,6,14-20; | [XYI]JP2013211294 (AUTO SPLICE KK) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,13 * abstract * * figures 1-3,8-11 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0003] , [0004] , [0007] , [0026] , [0027] , [0038] , [0039] * [Y] 11,12 [I] 5,6,14-20 | by applicant | US9055666 |